IL HB4254 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a Section concerning the valuation of vegetative filter strips is repealed on December 31, 2026 (instead of December 31, 2016).
Title
PROP TX-FILTER STRIP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-08-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-07-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-21 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4254&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4254.htm |