IL HB4253 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Water District Act. Provides that an appointing authority may remove a public water district trustee it appointed for misconduct, official misconduct, or neglect of office. Effective immediately.
Title
WATER DISTRICT-TRUSTEE REMOVAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0737 |
2018-08-07 | House | Effective Date August 7, 2018 |
2018-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3705 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |