IL HB4253 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Removes references to General Assembly members from provisions concerning funding for salaries of General Assembly members, judges, and legislative operations. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE BUDGET-GA MEMBER SALARY
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-07-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-07-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-07-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-07-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-07-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-07-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4253&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4253.htm |