IL HB4252 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that the notice of a recipient's rights includes, if applicable, the recipient's right to request a transfer to a different Department of Human Services facility. Provides that a recipient, his or her attorney, guardian, if any, and responsible relative, in any Department facility may make a written application to the facility director of the recipient's current facility to transfer to another Department facility. Provides that the Department shall provide the form to make such an application to a recipient, his or her attorney, guardian, if any, and responsible relative upon request. Provides that a recipient of services shall not include a person with the primary diagnosis of a developmental disability. Provides that upon receipt of the recipient's application, the facility director shall promptly schedule a hearing to be held within 7 days. Provides that the hearing shall be held at the recipient's current facility. Establishes the recipient's burden of proof at the transfer hearing. Provides that if a recipient's application for transfer is denied, no application may be filed for 180 days. Provides that the recipient does, however, have the right to administratively appeal any decision of the utilization review committee. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD CD-TRANSFER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-002-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 2-200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 5 | 3-207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
405 | 5 | 3-908 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4252&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4252.htm |