IL HB4251 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that any purchase by a township for services, materials, equipment, or supplies in excess of $30,000 (rather than $20,000) shall be contracted in specified ways. Provides that contracts for construction work whose estimated cost will exceed $30,000 (rather than $20,000) for township waterworks and sewerage systems shall be let to the lowest responsible bidder. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD – COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0728 |
2022-05-06 | House | Effective Date May 6, 2022 |
2022-05-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 012-003-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 205-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 85-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |