IL HB4248 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the funds transferred each month to the Grade Crossing Protection Fund may go to the maintenance of safety treatments to deter trespassing. Deletes language providing that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall not order more than $2,000,000 per year in Grade Crossing Protection Fund moneys for pedestrian walkways. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Illinois Commerce Commission, after a hearing or by stipulated agreement, to authorize and order the terms of installation, operation, maintenance, and use of safety treatments requested by a public authority or rail carrier to deter trespassing on railroad property at a place other than a public crossing.
Title
GRADE CROSSING PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18c-7401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |