IL HB4246 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for 100% of the income of a qualified new business. Provides that the term "qualified new business” means a business that has its principal place of business in the State and first begins operating in the State during the taxable year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-NEW BUSINESSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-08HouseTo Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
2024-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2024-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2024-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
2024-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2024-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-11-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback