IL HB4244 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Immunization Data Registry Act. Provides that health care providers, physician's designees, or pharmacist's designees shall (rather than may) provide immunization data to be entered into the immunization data registry. Provides that the written information and the immunization data exemption forms must include information that the health care provider shall (rather than may) report immunization data to the Department of Public Health to be entered into the immunization data registry. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
IMMUNIZATIONS-DATA REGISTRY
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | To Special Issues (HS) Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 527 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4244&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4244.htm |