IL HB4244 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that township electors in McHenry County may petition for a referendum at the next election to dissolve a township. Sets forth the requirements for the petition, together with the form and requirements for the ballot referendum to approve the dissolution. Provides for the transfer to McHenry County of all real and personal property, and any other assets, together with all personnel, contractual obligations, and liabilities of the dissolving township. Provides that all road districts wholly within the boundaries of the dissolving township are dissolved on the date of dissolution of the dissolving township and the powers and responsibilities of the road district are transferred to McHenry County. Provides that municipalities within the dissolving township may elect to assume the duties and responsibilities of the road district or road districts. Amends the Election Code and Counties Code making conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MCHENRY COUNTY-TWP DISSOLUTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10528-7Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1184New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-15New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-20New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-25New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-30New CodeSee Bill Text
60124-5New CodeSee Bill Text
601Art. 24 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback