IL HB4243 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that no public funds, including, but not limited to, funds appropriated for the pay and allowances of members of the General Assembly, shall be used to create a payout of money to any person involved with and relevant to allegations and investigations of sexual harassment by a member of the General Assembly. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROHIBIT SEX HARASSMENT PAYOFF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251155New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback