IL HB4243 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code with respect to the debt limitations of school districts. Allows Bureau Valley Community Unit School District 340 to issue bonds with an aggregate principal amount not to exceed $25,000,000 if, among other conditions, (i) the voters of the district approve a proposition for the bond issuance at an election held on or after March 15, 2016; (ii) prior to the issuance of the bonds, the school board determines that the renovating and equipping of some existing school buildings, the building and equipping of new school buildings, and the demolishing of some existing school buildings is required as a result of the age and condition of existing school buildings; and (iii) the bonds are issued, in one or more issuances, on or before July 1, 2021. Provides that the debt incurred on the bonds shall not be considered indebtedness for purposes of any statutory debt limitation and the bonds must mature within not to exceed 30 years from their date. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-BOND ISSUANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 19-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4243&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4243.htm |