IL HB4242 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0926
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Expands eligibility under the Department of Human Services' Child Care Assistance Program to include the following categories of families: (i) youth in care who are parents, regardless of income or whether they are working or participating in Department-approved employment or education or training programs; and (ii) families receiving Extended Family Support Program services from the Department of Children and Family Services, regardless of income or whether they are working or participating in Department-approved employment or education or training programs. Provides that beginning October 1, 2023, and every October 1 thereafter, the Department of Children and Family Services shall report to the General Assembly on the number of children who received child care via vouchers paid for by the Department of Children and Family Services during the preceding fiscal year. Requires the report to include the ages of children who received child care, the type of child care they received, and the number of months they received child care. Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Expands the definition of "eligible infants and toddlers" to include any child under the age of 3 who is the subject of a substantiated case of child abuse or neglect as defined in the federal Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act. Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the rates paid to day care providers by the Department of Children and Family Services shall match the rates paid to child care providers by the Department of Human Services under the child care assistance program, including base rates and any relevant rate enhancements. Effective immediately, except that certain provisions take effect on July 1, 2023.
Title
CHILD CARE-FOSTER YOUTH W/KIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0926 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022; - Some Provisions Effective July 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 069-044-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-005-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-013-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 009-005-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-042-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |