IL HB4242 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body shall provide notice to the public if the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body enters into a severance agreement with an employee or contractor accused of sexual harassment or sexual discrimination. Provides that no more than 72 hours after the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body makes a payment under the severance agreement, the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body shall publish on its Internet website and cause to be published, for a period of not less than 7 days, in the newspaper of general circulation having the largest circulation within the jurisdiction of the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body the following information: (1) the name of the person receiving the payment; (2) the amount of the payment; and (3) the fact that the person receiving the payment has been accused of sexual harassment or sexual discrimination, as the case may be. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-HARASSMENT SETTLMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-001-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-29HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51402.25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4242&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4242sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4242_03072018_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4242_05232018_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4242sam002_05312018_038000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback