IL HB4242 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body shall provide notice to the public if the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body enters into a severance agreement with an employee or contractor accused of sexual harassment or sexual discrimination. Provides that no more than 72 hours after the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body makes a payment under the severance agreement, the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body shall publish on its Internet website and cause to be published, for a period of not less than 7 days, in the newspaper of general circulation having the largest circulation within the jurisdiction of the unit of local government, school district, community college district, or other local taxing body the following information: (1) the name of the person receiving the payment; (2) the amount of the payment; and (3) the fact that the person receiving the payment has been accused of sexual harassment or sexual discrimination, as the case may be. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-HARASSMENT SETTLMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1040 |
2018-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2018 |
2018-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-001-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-01-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |