IL HB4237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the contributions made by the taxpayer to the Illinois Excellence Fund during the taxable year. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Excellence Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used for exclusively public purposes, as specified under Section 170 of the Internal Revenue Code relating to charitable contributions and gifts. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board may establish a fund in the county treasury for the purpose of accepting contributions for exclusively public purposes, as specified under Section 170 of the Internal Revenue Code relating to charitable contributions and gifts and may provide for a credit against the taxpayer's property tax liability in an amount equal to the amount of the contribution. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-CHARITABLE CONTRIBUTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-001
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-05-03SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-015-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-02-14HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-14HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-06HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-01-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-01-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-01-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-11HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-11HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-105New CodeSee Bill Text
355228New CodeSee Bill Text
5555-1005Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback