IL HB4235 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-060-006
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-060-006
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a waiver or modification from mandates of the Code may not be requested from a provision in the Code governing tuition for non-resident pupils unless the area encompassing the school district requesting the waiver qualifies as a designated teacher shortage area as determined by the State Board of Education and approved by the U.S. Department of Education. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-MANDATE WAIVER-TUITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 37 N: 60 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 037-060-006 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000 |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |