IL HB4234 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 007-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Farmer Equity Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall ensure the inclusion of socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers, including socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers in urbanized areas, in the development, adoption, implementation, and enforcement of food and agriculture laws, regulations, policies, and programs. Provides that the Department shall: (1) consult with the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency, the Director of Natural Resources, the Executive Director of the Illinois Housing Development Authority, the Secretary of Human Services, and other interested parties of the public and private sector of the State on opportunities for socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers to coordinate State programs; (2) disseminate information regarding opportunities provided by, including, but not limited to, the United States Department of Agriculture, the United States Environmental Protection Agency, the General Accounting Office, the Office of Management and Budget, and other federal agencies that that have programs that may assist socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers; and (3) evaluate opportunities for the inclusion of socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers in boards, committees, commissions, and other similar positions created by the Department. Provides that on or before January 1, 2020, the Department shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on efforts to serve socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers and female farmers and ranchers in this State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED FARMERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 007-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 078-022-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-008-000
2018-04-09HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-09HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Agriculture & Conservation Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-09HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback