IL HB4234 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Farmer Equity Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall ensure the inclusion of socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers, including socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers in urbanized areas, in the development, adoption, implementation, and enforcement of food and agriculture laws, regulations, policies, and programs. Provides that the Department shall: (1) consult with the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency, the Director of Natural Resources, the Executive Director of the Illinois Housing Development Authority, the Secretary of Human Services, and other interested parties of the public and private sector of the State on opportunities for socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers to coordinate State programs; (2) disseminate information regarding opportunities provided by, including, but not limited to, the United States Department of Agriculture, the United States Environmental Protection Agency, the General Accounting Office, the Office of Management and Budget, and other federal agencies that that have programs that may assist socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers; and (3) evaluate opportunities for the inclusion of socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers in boards, committees, commissions, and other similar positions created by the Department. Provides that on or before January 1, 2020, the Department shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on efforts to serve socially disadvantaged farmers and ranchers and female farmers and ranchers in this State. Effective immediately.
Title
SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED FARMERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1039 |
2018-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2018 |
2018-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 083-018-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 078-022-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-008-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Agriculture & Conservation Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-09 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |