IL HB4232 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 029-065-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to publish a notice that the district's annual statement of affairs is available on the State Board of Education's Internet website and in the district's main administrative office (instead of requiring a summary of the statement of affairs to be published). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-STATEMENT OF AFFAIRS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 029-065-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-002-001
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback