IL HB4231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Authorizes certain hunters to wear solid blaze pink colored clothing (in addition to blaze orange colored clothing).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE CD-HUNTING CLOTHING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.33Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback