IL HB4231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Authorizes certain hunters to wear solid blaze pink colored clothing (in addition to blaze orange colored clothing).
Title
WILDLIFE CD-HUNTING CLOTHING
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] |
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0949 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |