IL HB4230 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that various information after an individual's arrest must be made available to the news media for inspection and copying as soon as practicable after the individual's arraignment (rather than in no event shall the time period exceed 72 hours from the arrest).
Title
ARREST RECORD-MEDIA INSPECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 205 | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |