IL HB4228 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Officer Compensation Act. Provides that the compensation of county elected officers shall be fixed by ordinance or resolution of the county board or board of county commissioners. Provides that in the ordinance or resolution fixing the compensation of county elected officers, the county board shall separately list each stipend an elected officer is expected to receive in addition to the compensation to be paid by the county. Amends the Counties Code. Removes a subsection providing that no county board may reduce or otherwise impair the compensation payable from county funds to a county officer if the reduction or impairment is the result of the county officer receiving an award or stipend payable from State funds. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY OFFICER COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 145 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-6001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4228&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4228.htm |