IL HB4226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0747
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0747
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall develop, publish, and disseminate a brochure to educate the general public on the effects of concussion in children and discuss how to look for concussion warning signs in children. The brochure shall be distributed free of charge by schools to any child or the parent or guardian of a child who may have sustained a concussion, regardless of whether or not the concussion occurred while the child was participating in an interscholastic athletic activity. Amends the School Code. Provides that, amongst other duties, the regional office of education (rather than the district superintendent or chief school administrator) of a public elementary or secondary school or charter school shall supervise an athletic trainer or other person responsible for compliance with the return-to-play or return-to-learn concussion protocol established under the Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall (rather than may) adopt rules governing concussion protocol under the Code, including, but not limited to, rules governing the informal or formal accommodation of a student who may have sustained a concussion during an interscholastic athletic activity.
Title
SCHOOLS-CONCUSSION PROTOCOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0747 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-307 | New Code | See Bill Text |