IL HB4223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the Supportive Living Facilities Program, provides that a supportive living facility includes a distinct physical and operational entity within a mixed-use building that meets certain criteria. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to accept for certification under the program any application for a site or building where some of the apartments or distinct parts of the site or building are designated for purposes other than the provision of supportive living services, but only if those other apartments or distinct parts of the site or building are not designated for the purpose of providing assisted living services as required under the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUPPORTIVE LIVING FACILITIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0583
2018-04-06HouseEffective Date April 6, 2018
2018-04-06HouseGovernor Approved
2018-03-16HouseSent to the Governor
2018-03-14HousePassed Both Houses
2018-03-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-31HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.01aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback