IL HB4218 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Collection Agency Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may discipline a licensee if a finding is made by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau or Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection that a licensee violated the federal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act or its rules.
Title
COLLECTION AGENCY DFPR ACTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 425 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4218&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4218.htm |