IL HB4216 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires a public school to permit a student, without the authorization of the student's parent or legal guardian or a physician, to possess or self-apply sunscreen that is regulated by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Provides that if a student is unable to self-apply sunscreen, a volunteer school employee may apply the sunscreen on the student if the student's parent or legal guardian provides written consent for the assistance. Sets forth provisions concerning liability. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SUNSCREEN PERMITTED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.67New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.60New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback