IL HB4213 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that notwithstanding any State policy or rule to the contrary, any State-owned motor vehicle requiring maintenance in the form of an oil change shall have such maintenance performed according to the applicable Department of Central Management Services policy which considers the manufacturer's suggested oil change frequency for that vehicle's particular make, model, and year. Provides that the Department shall evaluate the original equipment manufacturer's oil change interval recommendations and other related impacts periodically and consider policy adjustments as is cost and operationally efficient for the State. Provides legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS-STATE OWNED VEHICLES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-280Amended CodeCitation Text
2040567.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback