IL HB4212 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that the definition of "high-risk missing person" includes a person who is a veteran or active duty member of the United States Armed Forces, the National Guard, or any reserve component of the United States Armed Forces who is believed to have a physical or mental health condition that is related to his or her service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MISSING PERSONS-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0631
2018-07-27HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-27HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-08HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-01-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-01-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-01-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-01-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5072210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback