IL HB4209 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In a Section concerning kindergartens, provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, each school board must establish a kindergarten with full-day attendance (instead of allowing a school board to establish a kindergarten with half-day attendance or with full-day attendance); makes related changes. Repeals another Section concerning kindergartens on July 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-FULL DAY KINDERGARTEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-14 | House | To SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-12-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.19a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4209&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4209.htm |