IL HB4208 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any member of a governmental entity appointed by the president or chairperson of the county board, or by any member or members of the county board, shall abide by certain ethics laws (current law provides for a member of a governmental entity appointed by the president or chairperson of the county board only).
Title
STATE OFFICIALS-COUNTY-ETHICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0894 |
2014-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-02-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 70-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |