IL HB4208 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-14 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires that each chief procurement officer establish a goal of at least 10% of the total dollar amount of State contracts of agencies under the officer's jurisdiction to be awarded to veteran-owned businesses.
Title
PROC CD-VETERAN PREFERENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-23 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary G. Dahl | |
2009-04-23 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait |