IL HB4205 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require its schools to connect at-risk students in need of behavioral health support and all students with an individualized education program to either community-based or in-school behavioral health support. If the school board requires in-school support to be provided, such support does not have to be implemented until the beginning of the 2018-2019 school year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BEHAVIOR HEALTH SUPPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-001-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 002-001-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-14HouseTo SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.67New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.60New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback