IL HB4203 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that an action contesting whether territory annexed by a municipality is contiguous shall be commenced no later than 10 years after the date the annexation ordinance is recorded. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-ANNEXATION LIMITATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6557-1-46Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback