IL HB4202 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides for dyslexia screening guidelines and rules. Requires the State Board of Education to employ at least 5 dyslexia specialists or dyslexia therapists with a minimum of 5 years of field experience in screening, identifying, and treating dyslexia and related disorders to provide technical assistance and training. Provides that, beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, each school district must screen students in grades kindergarten through second (and in higher grades under certain circumstances) for the risk factors of dyslexia using a universal screener approved by the State Board. Sets forth what the screening must include. Provides for additional screening for a student who is determined to be at risk, or at some risk, for dyslexia to determine if a student has the characteristics of dyslexia. Requires the use of a multi-tiered system of support framework if screening indicates that a student has some risk factors for dyslexia or has the characteristics of dyslexia. Sets forth provisions concerning exceptions to screening, dyslexia intervention services, and reporting. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
SCH CD-DYSLEXIA SCREENING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4202&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4202.htm |