IL HB4199 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Includes in the definition of "item of contraband", a recording device and broadcast equipment. Defines "recording device" and "broadcast equipment". Provides that possessing contraband that is a recording device, broadcast equipment, or electronic contraband in a penal institution, on penal institution property, or within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution, is a Class 2 felony. Provides that a person commits unauthorized possession of contraband in a penal institution by an employee when a person who is an employee knowingly and without authority of any person designated or authorized to grant this authority delivers, possesses, conspires to deliver or solicits delivery, causes or permits delivery, or permits another to attempt to deliver, any item of contraband within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution. Provides that placing or causing to be placed, or allowing another to place or cause to place a recording device, broadcast equipment, or electronic contraband on penal institution property or within the proximity of penal institution property with the intent to disrupt safety, security, or operations of the penal institution is a Class 2 felony. Provides that if the intent is to deliver the contraband to an inmate, it is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-CONTRABAND-PENAL INST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720531A-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720531A-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720531A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback