IL HB4191 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that a person is immune from criminal liability for criminal damage to property and criminal trespass to vehicles resulting from his or her forcible entry into a vehicle and from civil liability for property damage if the person: determines the vehicle is locked or there is otherwise no reasonable method for the dog or cat to exit the vehicle; has a good faith belief that forcible entry into the vehicle is necessary because the dog or cat is in imminent danger of suffering harm if not immediately removed from the vehicle, and based upon the circumstances known to the person at the time, the belief is a reasonable one; has made a good faith effort to contact a 9-1-1 emergency telephone system operator, law enforcement, or the fire department, and if contact is not possible prior to forcibly entering the vehicle, the person makes contact as soon as possible after forcibly entering the vehicle; makes a good a faith effort to place a notice on the vehicle's windshield with the person's contact information, the reason entry was made, the location of the dog or cat, and the fact that authorities have been notified; remains with the dog or cat in a safe location until law enforcement or emergency responders arrive; and uses no more force than necessary to enter the vehicle to remove the dog or cat. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMUNITY-DOG & CAT-LOCKED CAR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-001-001
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-027-001
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-001
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2018-03-07HouseTo Tort Liability Law Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-01-31HouseTo Tort Liability Law Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-12-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510707.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback