IL HB4191 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that a person is immune from criminal liability for criminal damage to property and criminal trespass to vehicles resulting from his or her forcible entry into a vehicle and from civil liability for property damage if the person: determines the vehicle is locked or there is otherwise no reasonable method for the dog or cat to exit the vehicle; has a good faith belief that forcible entry into the vehicle is necessary because the dog or cat is in imminent danger of suffering harm if not immediately removed from the vehicle, and based upon the circumstances known to the person at the time, the belief is a reasonable one; has made a good faith effort to contact a 9-1-1 emergency telephone system operator, law enforcement, or the fire department, and if contact is not possible prior to forcibly entering the vehicle, the person makes contact as soon as possible after forcibly entering the vehicle; makes a good a faith effort to place a notice on the vehicle's windshield with the person's contact information, the reason entry was made, the location of the dog or cat, and the fact that authorities have been notified; remains with the dog or cat in a safe location until law enforcement or emergency responders arrive; and uses no more force than necessary to enter the vehicle to remove the dog or cat. Effective immediately.
Title
IMMUNITY-DOG & CAT-LOCKED CAR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-001-001 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-027-001 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-001 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | To Tort Liability Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-01-31 | House | To Tort Liability Law Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-01-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-12-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |