IL HB4188 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Meat and Poultry Inspection Act. In provisions concerning Type I establishments licensed under the Act, provides that the establishment shall be permitted to process meat and poultry from animals and poultry slaughtered by the owner or for the owner for his or her own personal use or for use by his or her household, to receive live animals and poultry presented to the owner to be slaughtered and processed for the owner's own personal use or for use by his or her household, and to process inspected meat and poultry for the owner's own personal use or for use by his household. Provides that the establishment shall stamp "NOT FOR SALE" in a prescribed manner on all carcasses of animals and immediate poultry containers for poultry slaughtered or processed in the establishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEAT/POULTRY INSPECTION-TYPE I

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
2018-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-01-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256505.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback