IL HB4184 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, on and after July 1, 2020, targeted dental services that are provided to adults and children under the Medical Assistance Program shall be established and paid at no less than the rates established under the State of Illinois Dental Benefit Schedule and shall include specified dental procedures. Sets forth the reimbursement rates for certain anesthesia services. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES-RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4184&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4184.htm |