IL HB4182 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to federal approval, no person who is an undocumented immigrant shall qualify for any benefits or assistance provided under the Code, including, but not limited to, any benefits or assistance provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, the Child Care Assistance Program, the Children's Health Insurance Program, the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance program, the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, and the medical assistance program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB AID-UNDOCUMENTED IMMIGRANT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-01-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.51New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback