IL HB4178 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Specifies that menstrual hygiene products shall be made available in all bathrooms (rather than in bathrooms) of every school building that are open for student use in grades 4 through 12 during the regular school day. Provides that the school employee or third-party contractor who is responsible for ordering, stocking, and replenishing the supply of toilet tissue and paper towels in school bathrooms shall be responsible for ordering, stocking, and replenishing the supply of menstrual hygiene products in the bathrooms. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-MENSTRUAL PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4178&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4178.htm |