IL HB4177 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that notwithstanding whether the laws of the state or territory where the non-resident resides related to firearm ownership, possession, and carrying, are substantially similar to the requirements to obtain a license under the Act, the Department of State Police shall by rule allow for a non-resident license application if the applicant is an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State or the spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed in this State. Provides that the applicant shall pay the resident license or renewal fees (rather than the non-resident fees). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY FEE-MILITARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseTabled
2018-04-12HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-09HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-12-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306640Amended CodeCitation Text
4306660Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback