IL HB4174 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the health examinations and immunizations that school children are required to receive, provides that a child may not be required to submit proof of having received an immunization against COVID-19 upon enrolling in school nor may a child already enrolled in school be required to receive an immunization against COVID-19. Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Pursuant to the School Code provisions, prohibits the Department of Public Health from adopting any rules that require children to receive an immunization against COVID-19. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CHILDREN-COVID-19 VACCINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-10-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 315 | 2f | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4174&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4174.htm |