IL HB4172 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the River Edge Redevelopment Zone Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may certify one additional pilot River Edge Redevelopment Zone in the City of Kankakee. Effective immediately.
Title
RIVER EDGE REDEVELOP-KANKAKEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-11-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 115 | 10-5.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4172&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4172.htm |