IL HB4170 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the issuance of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers decals by an Illinois chapter of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. Provides that $10 of each original issuance and $23 of each renewal shall be deposited into the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fund. Provides that money in the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fund shall be paid as grants to any local chapter of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers that is located in the State. Amends the State Finance Act to create the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
VEH CD-IBEW SPECIAL PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0665 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-05-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-24 | House | Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |