IL HB4167 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Allows a student enrolled in an educator preparation program at a regionally accredited institution of higher education to apply for a substitute teaching license if the student has earned at least 90 credit hours at that institution (rather than requiring all applicants to hold a bachelor's degree or higher). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SUBSTITUTE TEACHER LIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 003-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-02-07HouseTo Special Issues Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-11-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback