IL HB4165 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Prohibits the Director of the Illinois Department of Central Management Services and the State from applying for any federal waiver that would reduce or eliminate any protection or coverage required under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (ACA) that was in effect on January 1, 2017, including, but not limited to, any protection for persons with pre-existing conditions and coverage for services identified as essential health benefits under the ACA. Provides that the Director may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through a joint resolution. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Prohibits the State from applying for any federal waiver that would permit an individual or group health insurance plan to reduce or eliminate any protection or coverage required under the ACA that was in effect on January 1, 2017, including, but not limited to, any protection for persons with pre-existing conditions and coverage for services identified as essential health benefits under the ACA. Provides that the State may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through a joint resolution. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Prohibits the State from applying for any waiver of federal Medicaid requirements that would reduce or eliminate any protection or coverage required under the ACA that was in effect on January 1, 2017. Provides that the State may apply for such a waiver only if granted authorization by the General Assembly through a joint resolution. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS-DHFS-ACA PROTECTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseTotal Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-020-000
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-30SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-004-000
2018-05-30SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-30SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-29SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-048-000
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-29HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-006-000
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-11-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.29New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-36New CodeSee Bill Text
537518New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback