IL HB4164 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that an exemption from the Code for purchases of care shall continue except as otherwise provided. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of this amendatory Act, any contract the Department of Healthcare and Family Services enters into with a managed care organization shall be procured in accordance with the Illinois Procurement Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MANAGED CARE PROCUREMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-11-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-30.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback