IL HB4161 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for donations to the 100 Club of Illinois Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys deposited into the Fund shall be used to make grants to the 100 Club of Illinois for services in Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-100 CLUB CHECKOFF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1060 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Eric Mattson |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-01-27 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 507LLL | New Code | See Bill Text |